LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AJR42
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AJR42
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AJR42
Compare Versions
AJR42 Chaptered August 30, 2016
AJR42 Enrolled August 23, 2016
AJR42 Amended August 8, 2016
AJR42 Amended June 30, 2016
AJR42 Introduced June 1, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AJR42 Chaptered August 30, 2016
AJR42 Enrolled August 23, 2016
AJR42 Amended August 8, 2016
AJR42 Amended June 30, 2016
AJR42 Introduced June 1, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare