|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 783, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5402.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6101.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 23. Page 5945.) Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5968.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 5473.) Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 5473.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
June 21 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B. & P. and TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4041.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4002.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3313.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|