California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1046 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 8, 2016
Bill April 13, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016