LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1046
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1046
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1046
Compare Versions
SB1046 Chaptered September 28, 2016
SB1046 Enrolled August 29, 2016
SB1046 Amended August 19, 2016
SB1046 Amended August 15, 2016
SB1046 Amended August 1, 2016
SB1046 Amended June 8, 2016
SB1046 Amended April 13, 2016
SB1046 Amended March 17, 2016
SB1046 Introduced February 12, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1046 Chaptered September 28, 2016
SB1046 Enrolled August 29, 2016
SB1046 Amended August 19, 2016
SB1046 Amended August 15, 2016
SB1046 Amended August 1, 2016
SB1046 Amended June 8, 2016
SB1046 Amended April 13, 2016
SB1046 Amended March 17, 2016
SB1046 Introduced February 12, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare