|
09/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 838, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 5373.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 6012.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5949.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 4083.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 18. Page 4065.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Leno. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4066.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3766.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 3. Page 3606.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2016
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
April 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2016
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|