California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1150 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 23, 2016
Bill June 13, 2016
Bill May 26, 2016
Bill May 16, 2016
Bill May 10, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016