LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1150
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1150
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1150
Compare Versions
SB1150 Chaptered September 29, 2016
SB1150 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB1150 Amended August 19, 2016
SB1150 Amended August 15, 2016
SB1150 Amended June 30, 2016
SB1150 Amended June 23, 2016
SB1150 Amended June 13, 2016
SB1150 Amended May 26, 2016
SB1150 Amended May 16, 2016
SB1150 Amended May 10, 2016
SB1150 Amended April 26, 2016
SB1150 Amended March 28, 2016
SB1150 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1150 Chaptered September 29, 2016
SB1150 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB1150 Amended August 19, 2016
SB1150 Amended August 15, 2016
SB1150 Amended June 30, 2016
SB1150 Amended June 23, 2016
SB1150 Amended June 13, 2016
SB1150 Amended May 26, 2016
SB1150 Amended May 16, 2016
SB1150 Amended May 10, 2016
SB1150 Amended April 26, 2016
SB1150 Amended March 28, 2016
SB1150 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare