|
08/26/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 215, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5375.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 6019.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 4124.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4007.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2016
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 3617.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
April 12 hearing: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
April 5 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2016
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|