California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1279 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 4, 2016
Bill June 20, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016
Bill April 4, 2016
Bill March 30, 2016