LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1279
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1279
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1279
Compare Versions
SB1279 Chaptered August 26, 2016
SB1279 Enrolled August 25, 2016
SB1279 Amended August 4, 2016
SB1279 Amended June 20, 2016
SB1279 Amended May 31, 2016
SB1279 Amended April 26, 2016
SB1279 Amended April 4, 2016
SB1279 Amended March 30, 2016
SB1279 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1279 Chaptered August 26, 2016
SB1279 Enrolled August 25, 2016
SB1279 Amended August 4, 2016
SB1279 Amended June 20, 2016
SB1279 Amended May 31, 2016
SB1279 Amended April 26, 2016
SB1279 Amended April 4, 2016
SB1279 Amended March 30, 2016
SB1279 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare