|
09/03/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 255, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2204.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2534.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 837.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 405.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|