LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB13
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB13
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB13
Compare Versions
SB13 Chaptered September 3, 2015
SB13 Enrolled August 27, 2015
SB13 Amended July 6, 2015
SB13 Amended June 24, 2015
SB13 Amended May 21, 2015
SB13 Amended April 23, 2015
SB13 Amended February 24, 2015
SB13 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB13 Chaptered September 3, 2015
SB13 Enrolled August 27, 2015
SB13 Amended July 6, 2015
SB13 Amended June 24, 2015
SB13 Amended May 21, 2015
SB13 Amended April 23, 2015
SB13 Amended February 24, 2015
SB13 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare