LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB13
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB13
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB13
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
December 1, 2014
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
August 27, 2015
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
September 3, 2015
Compare
Amended
Bill
July 6, 2015
Compare
Bill
June 24, 2015
Compare
Bill
May 21, 2015
Compare
Bill
April 23, 2015
Compare
Bill
February 24, 2015
Compare