|
09/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 732, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 5491.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 18. Page 6227.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 4034.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4010.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2016
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3689.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
March 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2016
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|