LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1413
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1413
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1413
Compare Versions
SB1413 Chaptered September 27, 2016
SB1413 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB1413 Amended June 16, 2016
SB1413 Amended May 10, 2016
SB1413 Amended April 27, 2016
SB1413 Amended April 19, 2016
SB1413 Amended March 30, 2016
SB1413 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1413 Chaptered September 27, 2016
SB1413 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB1413 Amended June 16, 2016
SB1413 Amended May 10, 2016
SB1413 Amended April 27, 2016
SB1413 Amended April 19, 2016
SB1413 Amended March 30, 2016
SB1413 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare