California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1413 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill June 16, 2016
Bill May 10, 2016
Bill April 27, 2016
Bill April 19, 2016
Bill March 30, 2016