|
07/22/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
07/22/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4655.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5403.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3536.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3394.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2016
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|