LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1431
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1431
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1431
Compare Versions
SB1431 Chaptered July 22, 2016
SB1431 Enrolled July 5, 2016
SB1431 Amended June 13, 2016
SB1431 Amended April 12, 2016
SB1431 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1431 Chaptered July 22, 2016
SB1431 Enrolled July 5, 2016
SB1431 Amended June 13, 2016
SB1431 Amended April 12, 2016
SB1431 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare