California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1431 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill July 5, 2016

Chaptered

Bill July 22, 2016

Amended

Bill June 13, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016