|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 5364.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5897.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2016
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 4143.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4011.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2016
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3418.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2016
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|