California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1439 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 1, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016