LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1439
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1439
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1439
Compare Versions
SB1439 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB1439 Amended August 15, 2016
SB1439 Amended August 1, 2016
SB1439 Amended June 1, 2016
SB1439 Amended March 28, 2016
SB1439 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1439 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB1439 Amended August 15, 2016
SB1439 Amended August 1, 2016
SB1439 Amended June 1, 2016
SB1439 Amended March 28, 2016
SB1439 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare