|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 650, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2776.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 11). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3176.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. September 11 hearing: Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file. From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Joint Rule 61(a) suspended. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3102.) Art. IV. Sec. 8(b) of the Constitution dispensed with. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2103.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2363.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2216.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2015
|
Set for hearing August 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
July 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2015
|
Set for hearing July 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1733.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
June 24 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
Set for hearing June 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
June 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Set for hearing June 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|