LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB150
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB150
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB150
Compare Versions
SB150 Chaptered October 8, 2015
SB150 Enrolled September 16, 2015
SB150 Amended September 11, 2015
SB150 Amended June 22, 2015
SB150 Amended June 4, 2015
SB150 Amended May 14, 2015
SB150 Introduced January 29, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB150 Chaptered October 8, 2015
SB150 Enrolled September 16, 2015
SB150 Amended September 11, 2015
SB150 Amended June 22, 2015
SB150 Amended June 4, 2015
SB150 Amended May 14, 2015
SB150 Introduced January 29, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare