California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB150 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2015

Amended

Bill September 11, 2015
Bill June 22, 2015
Bill June 4, 2015
Bill May 14, 2015