|
04/25/2016
|
Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2774.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3090.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
From consent calendar by Assembly Member Cristina Garcia. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2015
|
June 15 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1117.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 724.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
April 7 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|