LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB18
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB18
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB18
Compare Versions
SB18 Enrolled September 16, 2015
SB18 Amended August 24, 2015
SB18 Amended July 9, 2015
SB18 Amended May 21, 2015
SB18 Amended May 5, 2015
SB18 Amended March 26, 2015
SB18 Amended February 4, 2015
SB18 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB18 Enrolled September 16, 2015
SB18 Amended August 24, 2015
SB18 Amended July 9, 2015
SB18 Amended May 21, 2015
SB18 Amended May 5, 2015
SB18 Amended March 26, 2015
SB18 Amended February 4, 2015
SB18 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare