California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB18 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Amended

Bill August 24, 2015
Bill July 9, 2015
Bill May 21, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015
Bill February 4, 2015