California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB18 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/21/2015

 BILL NUMBER: SB 18AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 21, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 5, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 26, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE FEBRUARY 4, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senators Hill and Hueso DECEMBER 1, 2014 An act to add Section 307.5 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to the Public Utilities Commission. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 18, as amended, Hill. Public Utilities Commission: outside counsel. The Public Utilities Act authorizes the Public Utilities Commission to appoint an attorney for the commission who holds that office at the pleasure of the commission. The act requires the attorney to represent and appear for the people and the commission in all actions and proceedings involving any question under the act or under any order or act of the commission. The act requires the attorney to commence, prosecute, and expedite the final determination of all actions and proceedings directed or authorized by the president, except as otherwise directed or authorized by vote of the commission, to advise the commission and each commissioner in regard to all matters in connection with the powers and duties of the commission or a commissioner, when requested, and generally, to perform all duties and services as attorney to the commission that the president, or vote of the commission, may require of him or her. This bill would require that any contract or other agreement by the commission for services by outside legal counsel with respect to a criminal matter   to represent the commission in a criminal investigation initiated by any federal, state, or local agency  be approved by a vote of the commission and be subject to a 30-day review by the Joint Legislative Budget Committee before the agreement is entered into. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 307.5 is added to the Public Utilities Code, to read: 307.5. (a) Any contract or other agreement by the commission for services by outside legal counsel  with respect to a criminal matter   to represent the commission in a criminal investigation initiated by any federal, state, or local agency  shall be approved by a vote of the commission and subject to a 30-day review by the Joint Legislative Budget Committee before the agreement is entered into. (b) The Joint Legislative Budget Committee, as part of its review, shall consider all of the following: (1) The funds that the commission will use to pay for these services. (2) Whether the commission has followed all of the laws and procedures applicable to contracting for legal services. (3) Whether, and to what degree, existing programs and operations of the commission will be affected.