|
10/06/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 533, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2365.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2681.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 668.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 596.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|