California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB193 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2015

Amended

Bill June 8, 2015
Bill March 18, 2015