LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB193
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB193
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB193
Compare Versions
SB193 Chaptered October 6, 2015
SB193 Enrolled September 2, 2015
SB193 Amended June 8, 2015
SB193 Amended March 18, 2015
SB193 Introduced February 10, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB193 Chaptered October 6, 2015
SB193 Enrolled September 2, 2015
SB193 Amended June 8, 2015
SB193 Amended March 18, 2015
SB193 Introduced February 10, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare