|
09/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 807, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5422.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6055.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2952.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2934.) (January 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2016
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2016
|
January 19 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2016
|
Set for hearing January 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 2895.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2016
|
Set for hearing January 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
April 27 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
April 21 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|