LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB215
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB215
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB215
Compare Versions
SB215 Chaptered September 29, 2016
SB215 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB215 Amended August 18, 2016
SB215 Amended August 3, 2016
SB215 Amended August 1, 2016
SB215 Amended June 20, 2016
SB215 Amended May 23, 2016
SB215 Amended January 4, 2016
SB215 Amended April 15, 2015
SB215 Introduced February 12, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB215 Chaptered September 29, 2016
SB215 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB215 Amended August 18, 2016
SB215 Amended August 3, 2016
SB215 Amended August 1, 2016
SB215 Amended June 20, 2016
SB215 Amended May 23, 2016
SB215 Amended January 4, 2016
SB215 Amended April 15, 2015
SB215 Introduced February 12, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare