California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB215 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill August 3, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 20, 2016
Bill May 23, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016
Bill April 15, 2015