|
10/10/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 762, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 2367.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 15. Page 2630.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 1250.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1149.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
April 20 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 507.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|