LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB219
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB219
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB219
Compare Versions
SB219 Chaptered October 10, 2015
SB219 Enrolled September 1, 2015
SB219 Amended July 9, 2015
SB219 Amended June 1, 2015
SB219 Amended March 26, 2015
SB219 Introduced February 12, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB219 Chaptered October 10, 2015
SB219 Enrolled September 1, 2015
SB219 Amended July 9, 2015
SB219 Amended June 1, 2015
SB219 Amended March 26, 2015
SB219 Introduced February 12, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare