California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB219 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2015

Amended

Bill July 9, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015