|
08/11/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 175, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 33. Page 2436.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 927.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 729.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|