LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB227
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB227
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB227
Compare Versions
SB227 Chaptered August 11, 2015
SB227 Enrolled July 27, 2015
SB227 Amended April 27, 2015
SB227 Amended March 19, 2015
SB227 Introduced February 13, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB227 Chaptered August 11, 2015
SB227 Enrolled July 27, 2015
SB227 Amended April 27, 2015
SB227 Amended March 19, 2015
SB227 Introduced February 13, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare