California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB227 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 27, 2015

Chaptered

Bill August 11, 2015

Amended

Bill April 27, 2015
Bill March 19, 2015