|
09/28/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 353, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2274.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 4. Page 2625.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2015
|
June 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 954.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 907.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
April 7 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|