California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB236 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2015

Amended

Bill June 24, 2015
Bill April 29, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015
Bill March 24, 2015