LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB236
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB236
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB236
Compare Versions
SB236 Chaptered September 28, 2015
SB236 Enrolled August 31, 2015
SB236 Amended June 24, 2015
SB236 Amended April 29, 2015
SB236 Amended April 20, 2015
SB236 Amended April 15, 2015
SB236 Amended March 24, 2015
SB236 Introduced February 17, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB236 Chaptered September 28, 2015
SB236 Enrolled August 31, 2015
SB236 Amended June 24, 2015
SB236 Amended April 29, 2015
SB236 Amended April 20, 2015
SB236 Amended April 15, 2015
SB236 Amended March 24, 2015
SB236 Introduced February 17, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare