|
09/23/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 531, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 5424.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6102.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
June 29 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 2952.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2934.) (January 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2016
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2016
|
January 19 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2016
|
Set for hearing January 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 2908.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2016
|
Set for hearing January 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Hill.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 20. Noes 12. Page 1261.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Hill. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1261.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1146.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 650.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
April 8 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
March 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|