California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB24 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill January 5, 2016
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015