LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB24
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB24
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB24
Compare Versions
SB24 Chaptered September 23, 2016
SB24 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB24 Amended August 18, 2016
SB24 Amended January 5, 2016
SB24 Amended June 1, 2015
SB24 Amended April 21, 2015
SB24 Amended April 6, 2015
SB24 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB24 Chaptered September 23, 2016
SB24 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB24 Amended August 18, 2016
SB24 Amended January 5, 2016
SB24 Amended June 1, 2015
SB24 Amended April 21, 2015
SB24 Amended April 6, 2015
SB24 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare