|
07/13/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 79, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 1660.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 2148.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 836.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 729.) (April 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 418.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|