LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB242
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB242
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB242
Compare Versions
SB242 Chaptered July 13, 2015
SB242 Enrolled June 30, 2015
SB242 Amended June 22, 2015
SB242 Amended April 7, 2015
SB242 Introduced February 17, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB242 Chaptered July 13, 2015
SB242 Enrolled June 30, 2015
SB242 Amended June 22, 2015
SB242 Amended April 7, 2015
SB242 Introduced February 17, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare