California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB242 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2015

Enrolled

Bill June 30, 2015

Chaptered

Bill July 13, 2015

Amended

Bill June 22, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015